THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:13:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: 905 638 2320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: 905 638 2320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014