THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014