THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Somerville Rd
Building B
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-391-9988
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-1371 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa Orthopedic centre
Nepean ON K2G 1V7
Phone: 613-714-9449
Fax: 613-714-9456
Address: 211-210 Centrum Blvd
Active care PhysioOrleans
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Phone: 613- 841-1555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Somerville Rd
Building B
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-391-9988
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-1371 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa Orthopedic centre
Nepean ON K2G 1V7
Phone: 613-714-9449
Fax: 613-714-9456
Address: 211-210 Centrum Blvd
Active care PhysioOrleans
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Phone: 613- 841-1555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEITH LAURENCE MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEITH LAURENCE MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014