THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 05:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit115-116, 30 gibson drive
Markham Ontario L3R 2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 477 2225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Sep 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit115-116, 30 gibson drive
Markham Ontario L3R 2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 477 2225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Sep 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014