THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:59:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kawartha North Family Health Team
100 East Street South
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-738-5575
Fax: 705-738-5681
Address: Community Health Centre
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
Phone: 705-324-7323
Fax: 705-324-8411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kawartha North Family Health Team
100 East Street South
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-738-5575
Fax: 705-738-5681
Address: Community Health Centre
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
Phone: 705-324-7323
Fax: 705-324-8411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARGARET CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAINES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARGARET CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAINES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014