THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:04:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brentwood Recovery Home
2335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristina Levang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brentwood Recovery Home
2335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristina Levang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Nov 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 04 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kristina Marie Levang may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kristina Marie Levang may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2014