THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:02:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughn Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058832064
Fax: 9058832065
Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto Hypertension Clinic
Suite 312
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 647-313-6116
Fax: 647-313-3001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughn Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058832064
Fax: 9058832065
Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto Hypertension Clinic
Suite 312
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 647-313-6116
Fax: 647-313-3001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEZLIE ANNE MARKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEZLIE ANNE MARKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014