THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:41:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bern, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Bern, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bern, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
07 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2021 to 06 Nov 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
AVP - General Surgery
01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 07 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 06 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014