THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:14:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Ave.
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-470-6690
Fax: 416-470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Ave.
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-470-6690
Fax: 416-470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER SENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER SENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014