THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:47:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168137533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 300-81 The East Mall
George Hull Centre
Toronto Ontario M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168137533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 300-81 The East Mall
George Hull Centre
Toronto Ontario M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARFEEN ANJUM MALICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARFEEN ANJUM MALICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014