THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 243 Consumer's Road
3rd Floor NYGH Specialized Services
Elder Care Centre
North York Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6871
Fax: (416) 756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 243 Consumer's Road
3rd Floor NYGH Specialized Services
Elder Care Centre
North York Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6871
Fax: (416) 756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ESTHER GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ESTHER GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014