THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:18:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Spine Surgery
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Spine Surgery
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ALI AKBAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AKBAR is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AKBAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AKBAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AKBAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AKBAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AKBAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ALI AKBAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AKBAR is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AKBAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AKBAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AKBAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AKBAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AKBAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014