THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:29:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Boul De L'hôpital
Clinique Delta Santé
OBGYN
suite 220
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819- 303-1059
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Boul De L'hôpital
Clinique Delta Santé
OBGYN
suite 220
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819- 303-1059
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ROSE BOXHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOXHILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ROSE BOXHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOXHILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014