THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 425 St Mary Ave
Winnipeg clinic
30 Bond Street
Winnipeg MB R3C 0N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2049573257
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 126 3rd Street West
North Vancouver British Columbia V7M 1E8
Phone: (604) 990-9499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 425 St Mary Ave
Winnipeg clinic
30 Bond Street
Winnipeg MB R3C 0N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2049573257
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 126 3rd Street West
North Vancouver British Columbia V7M 1E8
Phone: (604) 990-9499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 04 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HAMID REZA BONAKDAR may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HAMID REZA BONAKDAR may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014