THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:02:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 661 University Ave
Public Health Ontario
Public Health Ontario laboratories
suite 1701
Toronto ON M5G 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-792-3423
Fax: 416-235-5800
Address: Unity Health Toronto
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 661 University Ave
Public Health Ontario
Public Health Ontario laboratories
suite 1701
Toronto ON M5G 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-792-3423
Fax: 416-235-5800
Address: Unity Health Toronto
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAN GEORGE NAIM HASSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAN GEORGE NAIM HASSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014