THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:50:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 15 Jul 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014