THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:24:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SMRITA KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SMRITA KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014