THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:10:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIEANNA PAIGE LIVINGSTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIVINGSTON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LIVINGSTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIVINGSTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LIVINGSTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIVINGSTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIVINGSTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIEANNA PAIGE LIVINGSTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIVINGSTON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LIVINGSTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIVINGSTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LIVINGSTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIVINGSTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIVINGSTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Mar 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Feb 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Mar 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014