THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:57:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Centrepointe Dr
Suite 406
Nepean ON K2G 6E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-228-4298
Fax: 613-228-2482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Centrepointe Dr
Suite 406
Nepean ON K2G 6E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-228-4298
Fax: 613-228-2482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE DOMINIQUE LANEUVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANEUVILLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE DOMINIQUE LANEUVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANEUVILLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014