THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:41:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Boston University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Radiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 35342
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Radiology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Radiology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Kishore Pandey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI
Medical School: Boston University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Radiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 35342
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Radiology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Radiology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Kishore Pandey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Dec 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 10 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SACHIN KISHORE PANDEY may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SACHIN KISHORE PANDEY may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Boston University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014