THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055791212
Extension: 562
Fax: 289-731-2024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Mutungi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055791212
Extension: 562
Fax: 289-731-2024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Mutungi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUMUSHABE MALIZA MUTUNGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTUNGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUMUSHABE MALIZA MUTUNGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTUNGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014