THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:57:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Developmental Services
42 King Street
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3927
Fax: 844-770-0410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Developmental Services
42 King Street
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3927
Fax: 844-770-0410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ALAN BRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ALAN BRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014