THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
5500 North Service Rd
Burlington Ontario L7L 6W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 315 9543
Fax: 905 592 2299
Address: 1280 Main St W
Department of Pediatrics
McMaster University
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 77577
Fax: 905-521-2654
Address: 100 Main Street West
David Braley Health Sciences Centre, 1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-521-9140
Extension: 24881
Fax: 905-296-0474
Address: 271 Cornwall Road
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Unit 201
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1
Phone: (905) 337-2112
Fax: (289) 351-3026

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
5500 North Service Rd
Burlington Ontario L7L 6W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 315 9543
Fax: 905 592 2299
Address: 1280 Main St W
Department of Pediatrics
McMaster University
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 77577
Fax: 905-521-2654
Address: 100 Main Street West
David Braley Health Sciences Centre, 1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-521-9140
Extension: 24881
Fax: 905-296-0474
Address: 271 Cornwall Road
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Unit 201
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1
Phone: (905) 337-2112
Fax: (289) 351-3026

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOREEN NAREE CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOREEN NAREE CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014