THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:58:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 44553
Fax: 9055771405

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 44553
Fax: 9055771405

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI IBRAHIM M ALSAGHEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAGHEIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI IBRAHIM M ALSAGHEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAGHEIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014