THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:01:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-715 Mackay St
Pembroke Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Tower D, 4th Floor
Pembroke ON K8A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: (613) 732-7115-

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-715 Mackay St
Pembroke Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Tower D, 4th Floor
Pembroke ON K8A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: (613) 732-7115-

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDIE DAWN BZDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BZDELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDIE DAWN BZDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BZDELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014