THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 00:26:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Dundas Street East
Toronto, ON
M5A 2B2
Toronto Ontario M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 364-2261
Fax: (416) 364-0822
Address: 1136 Centre St
Suite 209
Thornhill ON L4J 3M8
Phone: 1-877-505-0336
Fax: (289) 472-5657
Address: 175 Brentcliff Rd
Toronto, ON
M4G 0C5
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Phone: 416-495-0926
Fax: 416-495-7943

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Dundas Street East
Toronto, ON
M5A 2B2
Toronto Ontario M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 364-2261
Fax: (416) 364-0822
Address: 1136 Centre St
Suite 209
Thornhill ON L4J 3M8
Phone: 1-877-505-0336
Fax: (289) 472-5657
Address: 175 Brentcliff Rd
Toronto, ON
M4G 0C5
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Phone: 416-495-0926
Fax: 416-495-7943

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA LEAH FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA LEAH FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014