THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014