THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:30:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rome, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General and
Thoracic Surgery
1526 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augusto Zani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zani (CPSO#: 104505 ) Dr. E. Zani-Ruttenstock (CPSO#: 104974 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Rome, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General and
Thoracic Surgery
1526 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augusto Zani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zani (CPSO#: 104505 ) Dr. E. Zani-Ruttenstock (CPSO#: 104974 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Aug 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 05 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AUGUSTO ZANI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of General Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ZANI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. ZANI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AUGUSTO ZANI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of General Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ZANI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. ZANI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rome, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014