THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:32:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1493 Cambridge Street
Cambridge Hospital
Department of Orthopaedics
Cambridge Massachusetts 02139
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6176651566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital, C0-004, 339 Windermere Road, London, ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1493 Cambridge Street
Cambridge Hospital
Department of Orthopaedics
Cambridge Massachusetts 02139
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6176651566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital, C0-004, 339 Windermere Road, London, ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GUIDO ESPOSITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESPOSITO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GUIDO ESPOSITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESPOSITO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2014