THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:55:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1300 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout First Nation Health Authority
Approaches to Community Wellbeing
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-1802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1300 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout First Nation Health Authority
Approaches to Community Wellbeing
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-1802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LLOYD KENNETH DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LLOYD KENNETH DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014