THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Cardiology
28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014