THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Health Records Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2

Phone: 905-521-2100 ext.63315
Fax: 905-575-6344
Date Received: 07 Jan 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Health Records Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2

Phone: 905-521-2100 ext.63315
Fax: 905-575-6344
Date Received: 07 Jan 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014