THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital and
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital and
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EGIDIO SPINELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPINELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EGIDIO SPINELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPINELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014