THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:36:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Oct 2023
Summary:
Charges 
 
Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offences: 
 
1.  3 counts of Fraud Under $5,000, between June 9, 2020 and June 21, 2021, contrary to section 380(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
2.  3 counts of Trafficking in Schedule I Substances, between June 9, 2020 and October 1, 2020 and on or about May 31, 2021, contrary to s. 5(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act (Canada)


Date of Charge:  October 18, 2023   
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 05 Sep 2023
Summary:
Charges

Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offences:

1.       2 counts of Assault on a named person between May 1, 2022 and May 31, 2022 and on or about July 18, 2022, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.       5 counts of Fail to Comply with an Undertaking, between May 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 145(4)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.       Assault with a weapon, on or about May 8, 2022, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4.       2 counts of Assault – Choke, Suffocate, Strangle, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 267(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
5.       Sexual Assault, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
6.       Obstruction of Justice, between May 8, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 139(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
7.       3 counts of Utter Threat to Cause Bodily Harm or Death, between February 6, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
8.       Attempted Murder - Strangulation, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 239(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
9.       Forcible Confinement, between February 6, 2022 and February 20, 2022, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
10.     Mischief - Property Damage under $5000, between February 6, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 430(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
 

Date of Charges:  August 25, 2023 
Place of Charges:  City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 01 Sep 2023
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On August 29, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Victor Rogozovsky:

1.  Must reside with his sureties each and every night at specified address and abide by the rules of the household.
2.  Must remain in his residence at all times except for medical emergencies involving him or a member of his immediate family or in the direct presence of one of his sureties.   
3.  Must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a specified person except for required court appearances.
4.  Must not attend within 500 metres of any place where a specified person is known to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place known to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
6.  Must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
7.  Must remain in custody until a GPS monitoring device is available to place on his person and is applied.
8.  Rogozovsky will be subject to GPS monitoring by Recovery Science Corporation (RSC) and agree to abide by all of its rules and protocols by providing his signature on the GPS Rules and Protocols which will be attached to a release order as Schedule “A”.  These rules and protocols form part of the Release Order.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 May 2022
Summary:
Charges

Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offence:

1.  Assault on a named person on or about May 8, 2022, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  May 20, 2022 
Place of Charge:  City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Oct 2023
Summary:
Charges 
 
Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offences: 
 
1.  3 counts of Fraud Under $5,000, between June 9, 2020 and June 21, 2021, contrary to section 380(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
2.  3 counts of Trafficking in Schedule I Substances, between June 9, 2020 and October 1, 2020 and on or about May 31, 2021, contrary to s. 5(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act (Canada)


Date of Charge:  October 18, 2023   
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 05 Sep 2023
Summary:
Charges

Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offences:

1.       2 counts of Assault on a named person between May 1, 2022 and May 31, 2022 and on or about July 18, 2022, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.       5 counts of Fail to Comply with an Undertaking, between May 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 145(4)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.       Assault with a weapon, on or about May 8, 2022, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4.       2 counts of Assault – Choke, Suffocate, Strangle, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 267(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
5.       Sexual Assault, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
6.       Obstruction of Justice, between May 8, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 139(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
7.       3 counts of Utter Threat to Cause Bodily Harm or Death, between February 6, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
8.       Attempted Murder - Strangulation, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to Section 239(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
9.       Forcible Confinement, between February 6, 2022 and February 20, 2022, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
10.     Mischief - Property Damage under $5000, between February 6, 2022 and July 31, 2022, contrary to Section 430(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
 

Date of Charges:  August 25, 2023 
Place of Charges:  City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 01 Sep 2023
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On August 29, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Victor Rogozovsky:

1.  Must reside with his sureties each and every night at specified address and abide by the rules of the household.
2.  Must remain in his residence at all times except for medical emergencies involving him or a member of his immediate family or in the direct presence of one of his sureties.   
3.  Must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a specified person except for required court appearances.
4.  Must not attend within 500 metres of any place where a specified person is known to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place known to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
6.  Must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
7.  Must remain in custody until a GPS monitoring device is available to place on his person and is applied.
8.  Rogozovsky will be subject to GPS monitoring by Recovery Science Corporation (RSC) and agree to abide by all of its rules and protocols by providing his signature on the GPS Rules and Protocols which will be attached to a release order as Schedule “A”.  These rules and protocols form part of the Release Order.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 May 2022
Summary:
Charges

Victor Rogozovsky was charged with the following offence:

1.  Assault on a named person on or about May 8, 2022, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  May 20, 2022 
Place of Charge:  City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014