THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:57:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - General Surgery
23 May 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
EL - Surgical Oncology
28 Mar 2016 to 22 May 2016
University of Toronto
EL - General Surgery
29 Sep 2014 to 26 Oct 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - General Surgery
DATE: 23 May 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Surgical Oncology
DATE: 28 Mar 2016 to 22 May 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - General Surgery
DATE: 29 Sep 2014 to 26 Oct 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2014