THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:07:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8028

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Christopher W. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8028

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Christopher W. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christopher William McIntyre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Nephrology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
McIntyre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. McIntyre
no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christopher William McIntyre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Nephrology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
McIntyre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. McIntyre
no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2014