THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
EL - Medical Oncology
21 Sep 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
Queen's University
EL - Medical Oncology
20 Oct 2014 to 14 Nov 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Medical Oncology
DATE: 21 Sep 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Medical Oncology
DATE: 20 Oct 2014 to 14 Nov 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014