THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 200
North York ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-444-6161
Fax: 416-444-5849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 200
North York ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-444-6161
Fax: 416-444-5849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014