THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 21:44:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-673-9191
Fax: 416-673-9193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-673-9191
Fax: 416-673-9193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAT ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAT ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2014