THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
AVP - Family Medicine
20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014