THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:18:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Services Coroner's Complex
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 329-1921
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Services Coroner's Complex
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 329-1921
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2014