THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tzu Chi University College of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-1100 Burloak Drive
TeleCBT Inc.
Burlington Ontario L7L 6B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-468-6178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tzu Chi University College of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-1100 Burloak Drive
TeleCBT Inc.
Burlington Ontario L7L 6B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-468-6178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUI-HSIA HUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUI-HSIA HUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tzu Chi University College of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2014