THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:30:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODOLFO GUILLERMO VIGIL VERASTEGUI ROCHA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROCHA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ROCHA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROCHA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROCHA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROCHA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROCHA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODOLFO GUILLERMO VIGIL VERASTEGUI ROCHA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROCHA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ROCHA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROCHA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROCHA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROCHA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROCHA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
AVP - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
29 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
06 Nov 2019 to 28 Jan 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Cardiac Surgery
15 Dec 2014 to 31 May 2015
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
01 Dec 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 29 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 06 Nov 2019 to 28 Jan 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 15 Dec 2014 to 31 May 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Dec 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2014