THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:21:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
ALS Neuromuscular Clinic
Room UG26
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4213
Fax: (416) 480-6817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
ALS Neuromuscular Clinic
Room UG26
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4213
Fax: (416) 480-6817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AGESSANDRO ABRAHAO JUNIOR may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AGESSANDRO ABRAHAO JUNIOR may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2015