THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Medical Clinic
121 - 9401 Jane St
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-1080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faise Bugtor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bugtor (CPSO#: 105231 )
Business Address: Vaughan Medical Clinic
Unit 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(646) 535-7231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Medical Clinic
121 - 9401 Jane St
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-1080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faise Bugtor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bugtor (CPSO#: 105231 )
Business Address: Vaughan Medical Clinic
Unit 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(646) 535-7231

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISE TALAT BUGTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGTOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISE TALAT BUGTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGTOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: Vitebsk State Medical University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2014