THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontif¡cia Univ Cat¢lica de SÆo Paulo, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Division of Palliative Care
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Ottawa
Division of Palliative Care
BruyŠre Continuing Care
43 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Pontif¡cia Univ Cat¢lica de SÆo Paulo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Division of Palliative Care
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Ottawa
Division of Palliative Care
BruyŠre Continuing Care
43 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HENRIQUE AFONSECA PARSONS may practise medicine independently in palliative care.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HENRIQUE AFONSECA PARSONS may practise medicine independently in palliative care.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontif¡cia Univ Cat¢lica de SÆo Paulo, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2014