THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:24:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1-3770 Manor Street
Burnaby BC V5G 1A6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1-3770 Manor Street
Burnaby BC V5G 1A6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2015