THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:08:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 829 Cameron Road
Te Whatu Ora Hauora a Toi Bay of Plenty
Women Children & Family
Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Tauranga Bay of Plenty 3112
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +64021701203
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 829 Cameron Road
Te Whatu Ora Hauora a Toi Bay of Plenty
Women Children & Family
Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Tauranga Bay of Plenty 3112
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +64021701203
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JOY LEANNE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JOY LEANNE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2015