THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:28:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mental Health and addiction service
Horizon health
55 union street , 3rd floor
E2L5B7
Saint john New Brunswick E2L5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5066583737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. S. Bryniak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mental Health and addiction service
Horizon health
55 union street , 3rd floor
E2L5B7
Saint john New Brunswick E2L5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5066583737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. S. Bryniak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEVEN BRYNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYNIAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEVEN BRYNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYNIAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2015