THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pharmalinx Medical Centre
9301 Bathurst St, #8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052377472
Fax: 9052372854
Address: B-627 Lyons Ln
Oakville ON L6J 5Z7
Phone: 416-748-2800
Fax: 4167488865
Address: East York Town Center
45 Overlea Blvd, Suite B11
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 425-4122
Fax: (416) 425-6583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahshid Mohseni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pharmalinx Medical Centre
9301 Bathurst St, #8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052377472
Fax: 9052372854
Address: B-627 Lyons Ln
Oakville ON L6J 5Z7
Phone: 416-748-2800
Fax: 4167488865
Address: East York Town Center
45 Overlea Blvd, Suite B11
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 425-4122
Fax: (416) 425-6583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahshid Mohseni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHSHID MOHSENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHSENI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHSHID MOHSENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHSENI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015